2012 vacancies 5-22-122012 VACANCIES
Vacancies through 2012 as of October 4, 2011
Pension Board of Trustees
None for BMRC to address
Cultural Arts & Recreation Advisory Committee
Tammy Lally
Cris Garrard
Lynne Knecht Roskein
Hollie Stephens
Jolyn Johnson
Vacancy from Carolyn McCarthy
Code Enforcement Board
Veda Bernstein
Barbara Weiss
Ray Martin
Community Development Board
Kelly Elmore
A. Brea Paul
Harleston Parkes
Chris Lambertson
Status
Status
Active
Active
Active
Active
Active
Resigned
Status
Active
Active
Resigned
Status
Active
Active
Active
Active
Service (2 year terms w/ no term limit)
Service (2 year terms w/ 4 term limit)
1st
3rd
3rd
1st
3rd
N/A
Service (3 year term w/ 3 term limit)
2nd
3rd
N/A
Service (2 year term w/ 4 term limit)
1st Term
1st Term
1st Term
4th Term
Term
Expiration
Term
Expiration
7/8/2012
7/8/2012
7/8/2012
7/8/2012
7/8/2012
7/8/2012
Term
Expiration
9/30/2012
9/30/2012
9/30/2013
Term
Expiration
12/31/2012
12/31/2012
12/31/2012
12/31/2012
Termed
Out
Y or N
Termed
Out
Y or N
N
N
N
N
N
N/A
Termed
Out
Y or N
N
Y
N
Termed
Out
Y or N
N
N
N
Y
Interested
in Reappt?
Y or N
Interested
in Reappt?
Y or N
Y
Y
Y
Y
Y
N/A
Interested
in Reappt?
Y or N
N/A
N/A
Interested
in Reappt?
Y or N
N/A
Vacancies through 2012 as of October 4, 2011
Board Member Review Committee
Jim Smith
Board Member Review Committee
John Fletcher
The following Boards/Committees do not go straight to Commission:
Pension Board of Trustees
Cultural Arts & Recreation Advisory Board
Code Enforcement Board
Community Development Board
Status
Active
Status
Active
Citizen Members- 2 year term- 2 term limit
1st Term
Commission Member- 1 year term- No term limit
2nd Term
Term Exp.
3/12/2012
Term Exp.
12/1/2011
Termed
Out
N
Termed
Out
N
Interested
in Reappt?
Interested
in Reappt?
Vacancies through 2011 as of November 10, 2010
Pension Board of Trustees
B. Dale Hatfield (Police) Employee Elected
Status
Term
Expiration
Termed
Out
Y or N
Interested
in Reappt?
Y or N